AR SB2 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly 3rd Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Reenact The Original Date Of The Sunset Of The Arkansas Works Program.
Title
To Reenact The Original Date Of The Sunset Of The Arkansas Works Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | Notification that SB2 is now Act 13 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2016-05-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2016-05-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2016-05-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2016-05-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2016-05-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Filed |