AR SB207 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting A Person Required To Register As A Sex Offender From Being A Firefighter For A Volunteer Fire Department.
Title
Prohibiting A Person Required To Register As A Sex Offender From Being A Firefighter For A Volunteer Fire Department.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB207 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SB207.pdf |