AR SB3 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB3 is now Act 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB3 is now Act 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Travel On Certain Highways By Motor Vehicles Used For Farm Purposes; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Concerning The Travel On Certain Highways By Motor Vehicles Used For Farm Purposes; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Notification that SB3 is now Act 12 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-05-28 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-05-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-05-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-05-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-05-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Filed |