AR SB305 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Definition Of "neglect" And The Law Concerning Closures Of Child Maltreatment Investigations; And To Make Certain Acts Of A Parent, Guardian, Custodian, Or Foster Parent Noncriminal.
Title
To Amend The Definition Of "neglect" And The Law Concerning Closures Of Child Maltreatment Investigations; And To Make Certain Acts Of A Parent, Guardian, Custodian, Or Foster Parent Noncriminal.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2017-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed |