AR SB306 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow A Lottery Winner To Remain Confidential.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow A Lottery Winner To Remain Confidential.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-04-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-01SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-01SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-03-12SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-12SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-12SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-12SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback