AR SB377 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB377 is now Act 695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB377 is now Act 695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Collection And Distribution Of Solid Waste Disposal And Transportation Fees.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Collection And Distribution Of Solid Waste Disposal And Transportation Fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB377 is now Act 695 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-18 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |