AR SB399 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit Towing Of Vehicles By Chain, Rope, Or Cable.
Title
To Prohibit Towing Of Vehicles By Chain, Rope, Or Cable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-04-27 | House Returned to the Senate at Sine Die Adjournment | |
2011-03-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE | |
2011-03-24 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Filed |