AR SB411 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that SB411 is now Act 375
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that SB411 is now Act 375
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal The Requirement For The Administrative Office Of The Courts To Develop A Web-based Mandated Reporter Training Curriculum.
Title
To Repeal The Requirement For The Administrative Office Of The Courts To Develop A Web-based Mandated Reporter Training Curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Notification that SB411 is now Act 375 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed |