AR SB448 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB448 is now Act 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB448 is now Act 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Physicians To Have Certain Qualifications To Perform Abortions; And To Repeal The Presumption Of Viability Of A Fetus At The Twenty-fifth Week Of Pregnancy.
Title
To Require Physicians To Have Certain Qualifications To Perform Abortions; And To Repeal The Presumption Of Viability Of A Fetus At The Twenty-fifth Week Of Pregnancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB448 is now Act 700 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |