AR SB486 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB486 is now Act 886
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Special Annual Fee For A Trout Special Permit; To Authorize An Increase For The Special Annual Fee For A Trout Special Permit And The Fee For A Lifetime Trout Stamp And Lifetime Combination Trout And State Duck Stamp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Special Annual Fee For A Trout Special Permit; To Authorize An Increase For The Special Annual Fee For A Trout Special Permit And The Fee For A Lifetime Trout Stamp And Lifetime Combination Trout And State Duck Stamp.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB486 is now Act 886
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-05SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-05SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-18SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-18HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2019-03-11HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-11SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-07SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-06SenateRe-referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2019-03-06SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-06SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2019-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback