AR SB5 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly 3rd Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Earthquake Resistant Design Requirements For Buildings And Other Structures And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Earthquake Resistant Design Requirements For Buildings And Other Structures And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | Notification that SB5 is now Act 23 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2016-05-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2016-05-23 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2016-05-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2016-05-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2016-05-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2016-05-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Filed |