AR SB517 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide That Funds Received By Constitutional Officers Or State Agencies As A Result Of An Award By The Court Or Settlement Agreement Are Subject To Appropriation By The General Assembly.
Title
To Provide That Funds Received By Constitutional Officers Or State Agencies As A Result Of An Award By The Court Or Settlement Agreement Are Subject To Appropriation By The General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB517 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SB517.pdf |