AR SB54 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Use Of American-manufactured Iron And Steel In The Construction, Reconstruction, Alteration, And Improvement Of Public Buildings And Public Works.
Title
To Require The Use Of American-manufactured Iron And Steel In The Construction, Reconstruction, Alteration, And Improvement Of Public Buildings And Public Works.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-03-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed |