AR SB551 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Restrictive Covenants; And To Authorize The Termination Of Certain Restrictive Covenants.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Restrictive Covenants; And To Authorize The Termination Of Certain Restrictive Covenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed |