AR SB650 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend Act 3 Of The Regular Session Of 2013, The General Appropriation Act For The Ordinary Expenses Of The Executive, Judicial And Legislative Branches For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Act 3 Of The Regular Session Of 2013, The General Appropriation Act For The Ordinary Expenses Of The Executive, Judicial And Legislative Branches For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateSine Die adjournment
2013-05-17SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-04-17SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-04-17SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-17SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-17SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2013-04-17SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-03-27SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-03-27SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-27SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-27SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-02-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-02-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback