AR SB740 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide K-12 Scholarships To Economically Disadvantaged Students By Providing A Tax Credit For Contributions To Nonprofit Scholarship-funding Organizations; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Provide K-12 Scholarships To Economically Disadvantaged Students By Providing A Tax Credit For Contributions To Nonprofit Scholarship-funding Organizations; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB740 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SB740.pdf |