AR SB787 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Eminent Domain; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Eminent Domain; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed |