AR SB8 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Notification that SB8 is now Act 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Notification that SB8 is now Act 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Modification And Review Of Permits Issued By The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Modification And Review Of Permits Issued By The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Notification that SB8 is now Act 6 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2018-03-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2018-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2018-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2018-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Filed |