AR SB811 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend State Categorical Funding For The Education Of Economically Disadvantaged Students; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend State Categorical Funding For The Education Of Economically Disadvantaged Students; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Key [R] | Rep. James McLean [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-04-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB811 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SB811.pdf |