AR SB849 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Encourage And Support The Continuation Of Gas Utility Projects That May Not Be Economically Feasible Or That Result In Excess Investments.
Title
To Encourage And Support The Continuation Of Gas Utility Projects That May Not Be Economically Feasible Or That Result In Excess Investments.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R] | Sen. Bryan King [R] | Sen. Bill Sample [R] | Sen. David Sanders [R] |
Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R] | Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Sen. Uvalde Lindsey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB849 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SB849.pdf |