AR SB875 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Adjust Weekly Unemployment Benefit Amounts To The Expiration Of The Federal Nonreduction Rule On Benefits.
Title
To Adjust Weekly Unemployment Benefit Amounts To The Expiration Of The Federal Nonreduction Rule On Benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |