AR SB9 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Granting A Law Enforcement Officer Employed With The Social Security Administration Or The United States Department Of State The Authority To Arrest.
Title
Granting A Law Enforcement Officer Employed With The Social Security Administration Or The United States Department Of State The Authority To Arrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Returned From the House as Failed to Pass |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-03 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Filed |