AR SB90 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that SB90 is now Act 559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that SB90 is now Act 559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Evidence Presented During Probable Cause Hearings Held Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Evidence Presented During Probable Cause Hearings Held Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Notification that SB90 is now Act 559 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-03-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-18 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Filed |