AR SB954 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Arkansas Towing And Recovery Board, Possessory Liens On Motor Vehicles Related To Towing And Storage, And Foreclosure Of Possessory Liens On Motor Vehicles Related To Towing And Storage.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Arkansas Towing And Recovery Board, Possessory Liens On Motor Vehicles Related To Towing And Storage, And Foreclosure Of Possessory Liens On Motor Vehicles Related To Towing And Storage.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Sample [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-03-09 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB954 |
Text | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/SB954.pdf |