AR SB992 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Restrict A Member Of A Constitutional Commission From Seeking Another Civil Office During The Member's Term Of Service.
Title
To Restrict A Member Of A Constitutional Commission From Seeking Another Civil Office During The Member's Term Of Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |