AR SB999 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide That Possession Of A Firearm By A Person Or In A Person's Vehicle Is Not A Criminal Offense Unless The Possession Of The Firearm Specifically Violates Another Federal, State, Or Local Statute.
Title
To Provide That Possession Of A Firearm By A Person Or In A Person's Vehicle Is Not A Criminal Offense Unless The Possession Of The Firearm Specifically Violates Another Federal, State, Or Local Statute.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2013-04-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-11 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |