AR SCR5 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Support The Governor And Attorney General To Take Lawful Actions Within Their Authority For An Immediate End To The Pulaski County Desegregation Litigation And The 1989 Settlement Agreement.
Title
To Support The Governor And Attorney General To Take Lawful Actions Within Their Authority For An Immediate End To The Pulaski County Desegregation Litigation And The 1989 Settlement Agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2012-03-09 | House Returned to the Senate. | |
2012-03-09 | House Died in House committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2012-02-27 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES | |
2012-02-23 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read the third time and adopted. | |
2012-02-16 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Amendment # 1 and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2012F/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SCR5 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2012F/Bills/SCR5.pdf |