AR SJR10 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution To Amend The Process For The Submission And Approval Of Proposed Initiated Acts, Constitutional Amendments, And Referenda.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution To Amend The Process For The Submission And Approval Of Proposed Initiated Acts, Constitutional Amendments, And Referenda.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SJR10 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SJR10.pdf |