AR SJR7 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning The Review And Approval Of Administrative Rules By A Legislative Committee.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning The Review And Approval Of Administrative Rules By A Legislative Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2013-04-16 | House | Returned to the Senate as adopted. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2013-04-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Filed |