AR SR4 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution To Support Arkansas's School Children By Applauding Participation In The First® Robotics Program; To Encourage First® To Hold A Regional Competition In Arkansas.
Title
Resolution To Support Arkansas's School Children By Applauding Participation In The First® Robotics Program; To Encourage First® To Hold A Regional Competition In Arkansas.
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Key [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Read the third time and adopted. | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR4 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/SR4.pdf |