AZ HB2001 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona commerce authority; business incentives.
Title
Arizona commerce authority; business incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Governor Signed | |
2011-02-16 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-02-16 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-16 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-16 | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-21-0-0) | |
2011-02-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-15 | House read second time | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced in House and read first time |