AZ HB2001 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; prosecution; grants; acceptance
Title
Law enforcement; prosecution; grants; acceptance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 269.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |