AZ HB2003 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; nonprofit corporations
Title
Technical correction; nonprofit corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House final reading , voting: (38-20-2-0) | |
2010-04-29 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-29 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-29 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-6-3-0) | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-20 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-23 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-23 | House third reading , voting: (42-12-6-0) | |
2010-03-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-02-16 | House read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time |