AZ HB2005 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona masonic fraternity special plates
Title
Arizona masonic fraternity special plates
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Brown [D] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Rep. Laurin Hendrix [R] | Rep. Lucy Mason [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Rep. Jerry Weiers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-12 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Consent Calendar March 31, 2010 @ 11:42 AM with Objections | |
2010-04-06 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (47-12-1-0) | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-11 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-01-12 | House read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in House and read first time |