AZ HB2009 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Navigable stream adjudication commission; extension
Title
Navigable stream adjudication commission; extension
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] |
Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Rep. Tony Rivero [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] | Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] |
Rep. Michelle Udall [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 26 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-01-22 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefile |