AZ HB2012 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historic emergency vehicles; lighting; parades
Title
Historic emergency vehicles; lighting; parades
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 47 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-8-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-1-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefile |