AZ HB2028 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Candidate signs; prohibition; primary
Title
Candidate signs; prohibition; primary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-1-0-0-0) |
2020-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefile |