AZ HB2039 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; federal form; emergency voting
Title
Elections; federal form; emergency voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | Chapter 282 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-27 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2019-05-27 | House | House concurs |
2019-05-27 | House | House minority caucus |
2019-05-27 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-2-1-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefile |