AZ HB2039 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House third reading FAILED voting: (31-27-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House third reading FAILED voting: (31-27-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; reimbursement; wagers; machines
Title
Gaming; reimbursement; wagers; machines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-1-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-11-27 | House | Prefile |