AZ HB2074 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensing; foster homes
Title
Licensing; foster homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-25 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-17 | House | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2013-04-17 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | House RHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RHS Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RHS Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |