AZ HB2089 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; safety; threat assessment teams

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; safety; threat assessment teams

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2020-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-12HouseHouse PS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-2-0-0-0)
2020-02-03HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House PS Committee
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-06HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15160New CodeSee Bill Text
411729Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72620
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2089p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2089h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2089blanc.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2089bolding.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2089bolding2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2089education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2089kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2089public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72620&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72620&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72620&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72620&billStatusActionId=193777&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72620&billStatusActionId=194267&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback