AZ HB2123 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chapter 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chapter 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
TPT; distribution; community college districts..
Title
TPT; distribution; community college districts..
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Udall [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Rep. Reginald Bolding [D] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Chapter 241 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-28 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |