AZ HB2125 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - House third reading PASSED voting: (45-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - House third reading PASSED voting: (45-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic accident reports
Title
Traffic accident reports
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Chabin [D] | Rep. Albert Hale [D] | Rep. Justin Olson [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Rep. Steve Urie [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-15-0-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-12 | House read second time | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in House and read first time |