AZ HB2125 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax levy; community colleges
Title
Property tax levy; community colleges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Vetoed | |
2013-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-13 | House | House final reading , voting: (44-15-1-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-05-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-1-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |