AZ HB2125 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation; child care assistance
Title
Supplemental appropriation; child care assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Udall [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Rep. Reginald Bolding [D] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-13-1-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |