AZ HB2132 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Chiropractic assistants; scope of practice
Title
Chiropractic assistants; scope of practice
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-23 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Board Of Chiropractic Examiners
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Professions And Occupations - Title 32