AZ HB2166 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; cosmetology schools; contracts
Title
Technical correction; cosmetology schools; contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 12 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 12 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-3-0-0) | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (53-3-3-1) | |
2011-02-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-09 | House read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |