AZ HB2198 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Ganado School Loop Road
Title
Appropriation; Ganado School Loop Road
Sponsors
Rep. Arlando Teller [D] | Rep. Andres Cano [D] | Rep. Charlene Fernandez [D] | Rep. Alma Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Diego Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Athena Salman [D] | Rep. Myron Tsosie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-13 | House | Prefile |