AZ HB2201 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Private taxpayer rulings; unclaimed property
Title
Private taxpayer rulings; unclaimed property
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-12 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-22 | House third reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-21 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |