AZ HB2209 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public meetings; notices
Title
Public meetings; notices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-12 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Consent Calendar April 05, 2010 @ 3:05 PM | |
2010-04-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-22 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |